History of our boards of directors
Name | Role | Contact number | Start Date | End Date | Status | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Salehi, Niloufar | President | Salehin@kth.se | 6/21/2022 | 6/21/2024 | Done | |
Mazaheri, Arsham | Treasurer | arsham.mazaheri@gmail.com | 6/21/2022 | 6/21/2024 | Done | |
Manouchehr, Vosough | Membership Director | mano.vosough@gmail.com | 6/21/2022 | 6/21/2024 | Done | |
Neshat, Reza | Events And Activities Director | neshaat@gmail.com | 6/21/2022 | 6/21/2024 | Done | |
Hajari, Keyvan | Web Manager | keyvan.ha@gmail.com | 6/21/2022 | 6/21/2024 | Done | |
Fazlollahi, Hossein | Deputy Member1 | hofa@bredband.net | 6/21/2022 | 6/21/2024 | Done | |
Nikkhou-Aski, Sahar | Deputy Member2 | sahar.nikkhou.aski@ki.se | 6/21/2022 | 6/21/2024 | Done |
Name | Role | Contact number | Start Date | End Date | Status | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Salehi, Niloufar | President | Salehin@kth.se | 8/29/2020 | 6/19/2022 | Done | |
Homaei, Shabnam | Vice President | homaie.shabnam@gmail.com | 8/29/2020 | 6/19/2022 | Done | |
Hajari, Keyvan | Web Manager | keyvan.ha@gmail.com | 8/29/2020 | 6/19/2022 | Done | |
Gharibi, Hassan | Membership Director | hassan.gharibi@ki.se | 8/29/2020 | 6/19/2022 | Done | |
Neshat, Reza | Events And Activities Director | neshaat@gmail.com | 8/29/2020 | 6/19/2022 | Done | |
Mazaheri, Arsham | Communications Director | arsham.mazaheri@gmail.com | 8/29/2020 | 6/19/2022 | Done | |
Fazlali, Sarnia | Events And Activities Director | m.fazlali1983@gmail.com | 8/29/2020 | 5/15/2022 | Resigned | |
Dabaghi, Ataullah | Events And Activities Director | ata.dabaghi@gmail.com | 8/29/2020 | 6/19/2022 | Done | |
Fazlollahi, Hossein | Deputy Member2 | hofa@bredband.net | 8/29/2020 | 6/19/2022 | Done |
Name | Role | Contact number | Start Date | End Date | Status | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hajari, Keyvan | President | keyvan.ha@gmail.com | 6/19/2018 | 6/19/2020 | Done | |
Dabaghi, Ataullah | Events And Activities Director | ata.dabaghi@gmail.com | 6/19/2019 | 6/19/2020 | Done | |
Fazlollahi, Hossein | Treasurer | hofa@bredband.net | 6/19/2018 | 6/19/2020 | Done | |
Sabazade, Khosro | Treasurer | khosrow.sabazade@gmail.com | 6/19/2018 | 6/19/2019 | Resigned | |
Gharebaghi, Ali | Events And Activities Director | ali_gharehbaghi@yahoo.com | 6/19/2019 | 6/19/2020 | Done | |
Neshat, Reza | Communications Director | neshaat@gmail.com | 6/19/2018 | 6/19/2020 | Done | |
Soltanieh, Shahla | Membership Director | soltanieh.shahla@gmail.com | 6/19/2018 | 6/19/2020 | Done | |
Zolfaghari, Majid | Events And Activities Director | majid.zolfaghari.a@gmail.com | 6/19/2018 | 6/19/2020 | Done | |
Manouchehr, Vosough | Deputy Member1 | mano.vosough@gmail.com | 6/19/2018 | 6/19/2020 | Done | |
Akbari, Taghi | Deputy Member2 | mt.akbari@gmail.com | 6/19/2018 | 6/19/2020 | Done |
Name | Role | Contact number | Start Date | End Date | Status | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abri, Asad | President | assad.abri@abricon.se | 11/12/2014 | 11/12/2016 | Done | |
Musavi, Zari | Vice President | z.musavi@gmail.com | 11/12/2014 | 11/12/2016 | Done | |
Naraghi, Reza | Treasurer | reza.naraghi@gmail.com | 11/12/2014 | 11/12/2016 | Done | |
Alemrajabi, Mahmood | Membership Director | malemrajabi@gmail.com | 11/12/2014 | 11/12/2016 | Done | |
Radmard, Shabnam | Communications Director | shabnamrad@yahoo.com | 11/12/2014 | 11/12/2016 | Done | |
Nikkhou-Aski, Sahar | Communications Director | sahar.nikkhou.aski@ki.se | 11/12/2014 | 11/12/2016 | Done | |
Alipour, Dariush | Events And Activities Director | dariush_a@yahoo.com | 11/12/2014 | 11/12/2016 | Done | |
Navaian, Davoud | Deputy Member1 | navaian@hotmail.com | 11/12/2014 | 11/12/2016 | Done | |
Sabazade, Khosro | Deputy Member2 | khosrow.sabazade@gmail.com | 11/12/2014 | 11/12/2016 | Done |